EP3821918 - SCALABLE THREE-DIMENSIONAL ELASTIC CONSTRUCT MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allergan Pharmaceuticals International Limited Clonshaugh Business & Technology Park Dublin 17, D17 E400 / IE | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEISS, Anthony Steven c/o The University of Sydney Level 5, SIT Building (J12) The University of Sydney Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU | 02 /
MITHIEUX, Suzanne Marie c/o The University of Sydney Level 5, SIT Building (J12) The University of Sydney Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/20] | Application number, filing date | 20202023.6 | 10.12.2013 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | AU20120905409 | 10.12.2012 Original published format: AU 2012905409 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821918 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/22, A61K38/00, C07K14/78, A61L27/52 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
A61L27/227 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/22 (RU,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/17 (RU);
A61K38/39 (RU);
A61K8/64 (RU);
A61L27/26 (KR);
A61L27/52 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (RU);
B05D3/007 (US);
C07K14/78 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C09D189/00 (US);
A61L2430/34 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON SKALIERBAREM DREIDIMENSIONALEM ELASTISCHEM KONSTRUKT | [2021/20] | English: | SCALABLE THREE-DIMENSIONAL ELASTIC CONSTRUCT MANUFACTURING | [2021/20] | French: | FABRICATION DE CONSTRUCTIONS ÉLASTIQUES TRIDIMENSIONNELLES ÉVOLUTIVES | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 27.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13863652.7 / EP2928512 | EP18188002.2 / EP3449955 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9834563 (SISTERS OF PROVIDENCE IN OREGO [US], et al); | [A]US7125960 (KEIICHI MIYAMOTO [JP]); | [A]WO2008037028 (NG MARTIN KEAN CHONG [AU], et al); | [A]WO2008058323 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al) | by applicant | WO2007029913 | WO2008033847 | WO2009099570 | WO2011127478 | WO2012080706 |