EP3809041 - GAS COOKTOP BURNER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duffy, Patrick J. Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 02 /
Manrique, Victor H. Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 03 /
Johnson, Ken E. Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A., Patent Dept. Via Aldo Moro 5 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Spina, Alessandro Whirlpool Management EMEA S.R.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | [2022/40] |
Former [2021/16] | Spina, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA SpA Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 20202395.8 | 16.10.2020 | [2021/16] | Priority number, date | US201916656767 | 18.10.2019 Original published format: US201916656767 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809041 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3809041 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/06 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
F23D14/06 (EP,BR,US);
F24C3/085 (BR);
F24C3/08 (BR,US);
F23D14/58 (BR);
F23D2203/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GASKOCHFELDBRENNERANORDNUNG | [2021/16] | English: | GAS COOKTOP BURNER ASSEMBLY | [2021/16] | French: | ENSEMBLE BRÛLEUR POUR RÉCHAUD À GAZ | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 21.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2020 | AL | 05.10.2022 | AT | 05.10.2022 | CY | 05.10.2022 | CZ | 05.10.2022 | DK | 05.10.2022 | EE | 05.10.2022 | ES | 05.10.2022 | FI | 05.10.2022 | HR | 05.10.2022 | LT | 05.10.2022 | LV | 05.10.2022 | MC | 05.10.2022 | MK | 05.10.2022 | NL | 05.10.2022 | PL | 05.10.2022 | RO | 05.10.2022 | RS | 05.10.2022 | SE | 05.10.2022 | SI | 05.10.2022 | SK | 05.10.2022 | SM | 05.10.2022 | IE | 16.10.2022 | LU | 16.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | NO | 05.01.2023 | GR | 06.01.2023 | IS | 05.02.2023 | PT | 06.02.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
MK | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CY | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SI | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
IE | 16.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SK | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 05.10.2022 | |
AT | 05.10.2022 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
MC | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
CZ | 05.10.2022 | ||
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RO | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
EE | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
DK | 05.10.2022 | ||
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
SM | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
LU | 16.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
HR | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
PL | 05.10.2022 | ||
RS | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
IS | 05.02.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
LV | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
GR | 06.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 05.10.2022 | |
ES | 05.10.2022 | ||
FI | 05.10.2022 | ||
LT | 05.10.2022 | ||
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
SE | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
PT | 06.02.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 05.10.2022 | |
NL | 05.10.2022 | ||
NO | 05.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/17] | NL | 05.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2884176 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]WO2016142872 (DEFENDI ITALY SRL [IT]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 5 - page 11, line 4; figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP3306192 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1-4 * |