EP3786798 - COMPUTING CONNECTED COMPONENTS IN LARGE GRAPHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANADAKI, Seyed Vahab Mirrokni Google Inc. 1600 Amphtitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
KIVERIS, Raimondas Google Inc. 1600 Amphtitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
RASTOGI, Vibhor Google Inc. 1600 Amphtitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
LATTANZI, Silvio Google Inc. 1600 Amphtitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
VASSILVITSKII, Sergei Google Inc. 1600 Amphtitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk GST 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Roy, Arun Benjamin, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20202618.3 | 27.06.2014 | [2021/09] | Priority number, date | US201361841337P | 29.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361841337 P | US201314143894 | 30.12.2013 Original published format: US201314143894 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786798 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F9/54, G06Q10/06 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G06F9/546 (EP,US);
H04L67/10 (US);
G06F9/5066 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BERECHNEN VON VERBUNDENEN KOMPONENTEN IN GROSSEN GRAFIKEN | [2021/09] | English: | COMPUTING CONNECTED COMPONENTS IN LARGE GRAPHS | [2021/09] | French: | CALCUL DES COMPOSANTS CONNECTÉS DANS DE GRANDS GRAPHIQUES | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 25.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14744682.7 / EP3014444 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010083194 (BAGHERJEIRAN ABRAHAM [US], et al); | [I]US2011066649 (BERLYANT MIKHAIL [US], et al); | [I]US2013024479 (GONG NAN [SE], et al); |