EP3988134 - METHOD FOR SANITATION OR DISINFECTION WITH AT LEAST ONE AEROSOL CONTAINING DROPLETS OF A DISINFECTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boga GmbH Gesellschaft für Moderne Gerätetechnik Werkstrasse 16 59494 Soest / DE | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHLHOFF, Joscha 59510 Lippetal Brockhausen / DE | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Schäperklaus, Jochen, et al Fritz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 1580 59705 Arnsberg / DE | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20202880.9 | 20.10.2020 | [2022/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988134 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/12, A61L2/22, F24F6/12, F24F8/20, F24F8/24 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
A61L9/122 (EP);
A61L2/22 (EP);
F24F8/24 (EP);
A61L2202/25 (EP);
A61L2209/111 (EP);
A61L2209/132 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SANITATION ODER DESINFEKTION MIT WENIGSTENS EINEM AEROSOL, DAS TRÖPFCHEN EINES DESINFEKTIONSMITTELS ENTHÄLT | [2022/17] | English: | METHOD FOR SANITATION OR DISINFECTION WITH AT LEAST ONE AEROSOL CONTAINING DROPLETS OF A DISINFECTANT | [2022/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ASSAINISSEMENT OU DE DÉSINFECTION POURVU D'AU MOINS UN AÉROSOL CONTENANT DES GOUTTES DE DÉSINFECTANT | [2022/17] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005074359 (KRIEGER ERIC W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * paragraph [0054]; figure 1 * [I] 3,4,6; | [XI]EP2127686 (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0018] , [0020] , [0021] , [0023] - [0025] - [0027] - [0029]; figures 1,2 * [I] 3,4,6; | [XI]US2013183749 (AAMODT JAMES ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8 * paragraphs [0094] - [0106] - [0125]; figures 1,2 *[I] 3,4,6,7; | [XI]EP3108903 (SWINGTEC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8 * paragraphs [0030] , [0032] , [0033] , [0034] , [0035] , [3640] , [0041] , [0048] , [0049]; figure 1 * [I] 3,4,6,7 | by applicant | WO2013043409 |