EP3805188 - PHOTOCHLORINATION OF CHLOROFORM TO CARBON TETRACHLORIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Occidental Chemical Corporation 14555 N. Dallas Parkway Dallas, Texas 75254 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZELLER, Robert L. 3716 Hillsdale Drive Flower Mound, TX 75022 / US | 02 /
HOLLIS, Darrell 421 N. 12th Street Conway Springs, Kansas 67031 / US | 03 /
KRAMER, Keith S. 609 E. Crescent Lakes Drive Andover, Kansas 67002 / US | 04 /
CALDERWOOD, Brian 9801 W. Parr Lane Wichita, Kansas 67212 / US | 05 /
KLAUSMEYER, Rodney L. 1315 South Hydraulic Wichita, Kansas 67211 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20203089.6 | 30.06.2017 | [2021/15] | Priority number, date | US201662358340P | 05.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662358340 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805188 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/10 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
C07C17/10 (EP,US);
C07C19/041 (US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/10, C07C19/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHOTOCHLORIERUNG VON CHLOROFORM ZU KOHLENSTOFFTETRACHLORID | [2021/15] | English: | PHOTOCHLORINATION OF CHLOROFORM TO CARBON TETRACHLORIDE | [2021/15] | French: | PHOTOCHLORATION DE CHLOROFORME EN TÉTRACHLORURE DE CARBONE | [2021/15] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17745899.9 / EP3481797 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3676508 (KREKELER HANS, et al); | [ID]US9169177 (TIRTOWIDJOJO MAX MARKUS [US], et al) | by applicant | US6187978 | US6313360 | US2004225166 | US2009216055 | US2012310020 | US9169177 |