EP3812521 - FLUID MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU Industries SE & Co. KG Helmut-Wagner-Straße 1 95111 Rehau / DE | [2022/37] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states REHAU Industries SE & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Str. 2 95111 Rehau / DE | ||
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Otto-Hahn-Str. 2 95111 Rehau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Warnfried Margaretenweg 10 91315 Höchstadt an der Aisch / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 20203245.4 | 22.10.2020 | [2021/17] | Priority number, date | DE201920105919U | 24.10.2019 Original published format: DE 202019105919 U | [2021/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812521 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E03F1/00 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
E03F1/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLUIDMANAGEMENTSYSTEM | [2021/17] | English: | FLUID MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2021/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GESTION DES FLUIDES | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 28.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102007030305 (INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT PROF DR [DE]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2020099216 (ACO SEVERIN AHLMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1-8 * the whole document * |