EP3988367 - TANK FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.03.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Magna Energy Storage Systems GesmbH Tesma Allee 1 8261 Sinabelkirchen / AT | [2022/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URDL, Christian 8113 Hitzendorf / AT | 02 /
WIMMER, Florian 8334 Riegersburg / AT | [2022/17] | Representative(s) | Zangger, Bernd Magna International Europe GmbH Patentabteilung Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317 8041 Graz / AT | [2022/17] | Application number, filing date | 20203502.8 | 23.10.2020 | [2022/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3988367 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3988367 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/03, G01F23/32, G01F23/76 | [2022/17] | CPC: |
B60K15/03 (EP,CN,US);
B60K15/073 (CN);
G01F23/32 (EP);
G01F23/76 (EP);
B60K2015/03217 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03223 (CN);
Y10T137/7439 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] |
Former [2022/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TANKVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2022/17] | English: | TANK FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2022/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RAVITAILLEMENT POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2022/17] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 24.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 03.05.2023 | DK | 03.05.2023 | EE | 03.05.2023 | ES | 03.05.2023 | FI | 03.05.2023 | HR | 03.05.2023 | IT | 03.05.2023 | LT | 03.05.2023 | LV | 03.05.2023 | MC | 03.05.2023 | NL | 03.05.2023 | PL | 03.05.2023 | RO | 03.05.2023 | RS | 03.05.2023 | SE | 03.05.2023 | SI | 03.05.2023 | SK | 03.05.2023 | SM | 03.05.2023 | NO | 03.08.2023 | GR | 04.08.2023 | IS | 03.09.2023 | PT | 04.09.2023 | LU | 23.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 23.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
LU | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
MC | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
IT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SI | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 03.05.2023 | |
DK | 03.05.2023 | ||
EE | 03.05.2023 | ||
ES | 03.05.2023 | ||
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RO | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
SK | 03.05.2023 | ||
SM | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
FI | 03.05.2023 | ||
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
LT | 03.05.2023 | ||
LV | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
HR | 03.05.2023 | ||
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
RS | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
PL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
GR | 04.08.2023 | ||
IS | 03.09.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
NL | 03.05.2023 | ||
SE | 03.05.2023 | ||
NO | 03.08.2023 | ||
PT | 04.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 03.05.2023 | |
PT | 04.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE69318657T (FORD WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-6 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3; | [X]DE102007026146 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE102008045539 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-6 * figures 8-10 *; | [Y]KR20130026635 (MANDO CORP [KR]) [Y] 2,3 * figures 2,3,5 *; | [A]DE112012005441 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1* figure 1 * |