EP3821961 - PEGBOARD TYPE REHABILITATION TRAINING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEOFECT Co., Ltd. 401 West Building 152, Jukjeon-ro Suji-gu Gyeonggi-do, Yongin-si 16890 / KR | [2021/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Young Geun 114-1001, 80, Dongbaekjukjeon-daero 527beon-gil Giheung-gu 16990 Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
YANG, Dong Seok 206-901, 25 Hyoja-ro 11802 Uijeongbu-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
ROH, Sung Jun 103-303, 101 Deongneung-ro 70ga-gil, Nowon-gu 01772 Seoul / KR | 04 /
JANG, Dae Hoon 103-1003, 42 Donggureung-ro 53beon-gil 11919 Guri-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
PARK, Dae Kwan 201-1502, 21 Deongneung-ro 94-gil, Nowon-gu 01649 Seoul / KR | 06 /
YOO, Kyung Hwan 653-10 Haeannam-ro, Gilsang-myeon, Ganghwa-gun 23051 Incheon / KR | 07 /
BAE, Su Hyun 601 ho, 27 Bangullae-ro 11-gil, Mapo-gu 03961 Seoul / KR | 08 /
HAN, Seo Jeong 103-1302, 26 Yeonsudongsan-ro 27353 Chungju-si, Chungcheongbuk-do / KR | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 20204017.6 | 31.03.2017 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | KR20160039568 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: KR 20160039568 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821961 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/06, A63F9/00, A63F9/24 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
A63F9/0666 (EP,US);
A61H1/0285 (KR);
A63B22/00 (CN);
A63B23/12 (US);
A61H1/00 (EP);
A61H1/02 (US);
A63B24/0062 (CN,US);
A63B24/0087 (US);
A63B71/0009 (EP);
A63F11/00 (CN);
A63F9/12 (CN);
A63F9/24 (US);
A61H2201/1253 (KR);
A61H2201/1635 (EP,KR);
A61H2201/501 (KR);
A61H2201/5043 (EP,KR);
A61H2201/5048 (EP);
A61H2201/5058 (KR);
A61H2201/5064 (EP);
A61H2201/5071 (EP);
A61H2201/5097 (EP,KR);
A61H2205/065 (KR);
A63B2022/0092 (US);
A63B2024/0028 (CN);
A63B2024/0065 (EP,CN);
A63B2024/0071 (CN);
A63B2071/0625 (EP);
A63B2071/0675 (EP);
A63B2071/0694 (EP);
A63B2220/62 (EP);
A63B2220/80 (EP,US);
A63B2220/807 (EP);
A63B2220/833 (EP,US);
A63B2220/89 (EP);
A63B2225/50 (EP);
A63B2225/54 (EP);
A63B2225/74 (EP,US);
A63B71/0622 (EP);
A63F2003/00801 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | REHABILITATIONSTRAININGSSYSTEM VOM STECKTAFELTYP | [2021/20] | English: | PEGBOARD TYPE REHABILITATION TRAINING SYSTEM | [2021/20] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE RÉÉDUCATION DU TYPE À PANNEAU PERFORÉ | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 18.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/41] | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17775900.8 / EP3305265 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR100806024B (KIM HYUN JEEN [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]KR101005344B (TRAININGKIT CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0043] - [0076] ** figures 1-6 * |