EP3992380 - SHOWER DEVICE FOR MOUNTING ON A BASIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECHNER, Manuel 8722 Kaltbrunn / CH | 02 /
CODIROLI, Mattia 8808 Pfäffikon / CH | 03 /
ZWICKER, Maurus 8733 Eschenbach / CH | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB München Zielstattstraße 38 81379 München / DE | [2024/05] |
Former [2022/18] | König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zielstattstraße 38 81379 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20204352.7 | 28.10.2020 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3992380 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3992380 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/08 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
E03D9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/47] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DUSCHEINRICHTUNG ZUR MONTAGE AN EINER SCHÜSSEL | [2022/18] | English: | SHOWER DEVICE FOR MOUNTING ON A BASIN | [2022/18] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE DOUCHE DESTINÉ AU MONTAGE SUR UN BOL | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2021 | Examination requested [2022/18] | 22.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.10.2023 | 24.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]GB2102464 (MUSA GEORGE SAMUEL); | [XA]US4383339 (MILLER DANIEL C [US]); | [XI]WO9704698 (LATORA SALVATORE C [US]); | [XI]US2019186116 (SCHWAB BRIAN [US]) | by applicant | DE2410717 | EP2629546 |