EP3991940 - INJECTION DEVICE WITH ROTARY TABLE AND CLOSING SIDE WITH THREE SECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stefan Pfaff Werkzeug- und Formenbau GmbH Co KG Am Eisenberg 1 88167 Röthenbach im Allgäu / DE | [2022/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTTER, Anton 88178 Simmerberg / DE | [2022/18] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [2022/18] | Application number, filing date | 20205555.4 | 03.11.2020 | [2022/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3991940 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/06, B29C45/14, B29C45/04, // B29C33/00, B29C45/17, B29C45/26, B29C45/73 | [2022/18] | CPC: |
B29C45/14409 (EP);
B29C45/7312 (EP,US);
B29C45/0416 (EP);
B29C45/045 (US);
B29C45/062 (EP);
B29C45/14 (US);
B29C2045/14122 (EP);
B29C2045/14237 (EP);
B29C2045/1786 (EP);
B29C45/14008 (EP);
B29C45/1742 (EP);
B29C45/1756 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/49] |
Former [2022/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSPRITZVORRICHTUNG MIT DREHTISCH UND DREIGETEILTER SCHLIESSSEITE | [2022/18] | English: | INJECTION DEVICE WITH ROTARY TABLE AND CLOSING SIDE WITH THREE SECTIONS | [2022/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION POURVU DE TABLE ROTATIVE ET CÔTÉ FERMETURE EN TROIS PARTIES | [2022/18] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/49] | 28.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60154021 (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-7,15 * Para. [0001]; Fig. 1-5 *; | [Y]JPS62278016 (SANSHIN KOGYO KK) [Y] 12* Para. [0001]; Fig. 1-9 *; | [Y]DE69209408T (GENCORP INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,12 * Anspruch 1; Para. [0053, 0054]; Fig. 1-7 *; | [Y]US5566510 (HOLLINGSHEAD CHRIS J [US], et al) [Y] 9 * Fig. 8, 9 *; | [Y]JP2002079611 (HORI GLASS CO LTD) [Y] 8 * Para. [0029] *; | [Y]DE69732217T (LIBBEY OWENS FORD CO [US]) [Y] 8,10 * Para. [0037, 0056]; Fig. 8 *; | [Y]WO2017132382 (HENNIGES AUTOMOTIVE SEALING SYSTEMS NORTH AMERICA INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,8-10,12 * Anspruch 1; Para. [0026, 0028]; Fig. 7, 8 *; | [Y]CN111688108 (CHEN XIAOJUAN) [Y] 4 * Anspruch 2; Fig. 3, 4 * |