EP3819531 - MEMBRANE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danhydra A/S Lollandsvej 2 D 7400 Herning / DK | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOVE, Thomas c/o Danhydra A/S Lollandsvej 2 D 7400 Herning / DK | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Larsen & Birkeholm A/S Banegårdspladsen 1 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [2021/19] | Application number, filing date | 20205673.5 | 04.11.2020 | [2021/19] | Priority number, date | DK2019PA01300 | 07.11.2019 Original published format: DK PA201901300 | [2021/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819531 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3819531 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16N11/08, F16N11/10, F03D80/70 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
F16N11/08 (EP);
F16N11/10 (EP,DK);
F03D80/70 (EP,DK);
F16N7/385 (DK);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] |
Former [2021/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEMBRANVORRICHTUNG | [2021/19] | English: | MEMBRANE DEVICE | [2021/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF À MEMBRANE | [2021/19] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 12.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 24.01.2024 | NO | 24.04.2024 | RS | 24.04.2024 | GR | 25.04.2024 | IS | 24.05.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 24.04.2024 | |
IS | 24.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 24.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2005003619 (A T S ELECTRO LUBE HOLDINGS LT [CA], et al) [I] 1-3 * abstract * * figure 5; claims 1-15 *; | [XY]DE202007016788U (LINCOLN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,7 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 39 - page 6, paragraph 41; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,6,8; | [I]EP2472109 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1,8 * abstract ** paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-6 *; | [IY]WO2014077707 (PETROMAC IP LTD [NZ]) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0221] - paragraph [0229]; figures 35-37 * * paragraph [0233] - paragraph [0239]; figures 39-41 * [Y] 5,6,8; | [X]DE202015003601U (LANDWEHR MARKUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0046]; figure 3 * | by applicant | EP3260754 |