EP3944125 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING A HEAT EXCHANGER FOR SUPERCRITICAL PRESSURE FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tsinghua University A551, Lee Shau Kee Science and Technology Building Tsinghua University Haidian District Beijing / CN | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xu, Ruina Beijing / CN | 02 /
Jiang, Peixue Beijing / CN | 03 /
Wang, Chao Beijing / CN | 04 /
Zhang, Zhipeng Beijing / CN | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | Schrell, Andreas, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20205881.4 | 05.11.2020 | [2022/04] | Priority number, date | CN202010716041 | 23.07.2020 Original published format: CN202010716041 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944125 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3944125 | Date: | 16.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F30/28, F28F13/02, F28F13/08, G06F30/27, // G06F119/08, G06F111/08 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
G06F30/28 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (CN);
F28F13/00 (CN);
F28F13/02 (CN);
G05B13/042 (CN);
G06F17/18 (EP,US);
G06F30/27 (EP);
F28F2200/00 (EP,US);
G06F2111/08 (EP);
G06F2119/08 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/35] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WÄRMETAUSCHERS FÜR ÜBERKRITISCHES DRUCKFLUID | [2022/04] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANUFACTURING A HEAT EXCHANGER FOR SUPERCRITICAL PRESSURE FLUID | [2022/04] | French: | MÉTHODE ET SYSTÈME DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR POUR FLUIDE À PRESSION SUPERCRITIQUE | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/35] | 26.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN109508851 (UNIV XI AN JIAOTONG); |