EP3819198 - ADAPTER FOR ATTACHING OBJECTS TO THE TANK OF A MOTORCYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SW-Motech GmbH & Co. KG Ernteweg 8/10 35282 Rauschenberg / DE | [2021/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rhiel, Fabian Am Lohfeld 7 35274 Kirchhain Hessen / DE | 02 /
Stephens, Adam Am Berg 19 35232 Dautphe Hessen / DE | 03 /
Edelmann, Maurice Leide 22 35260 Stadtallendorf Hessen / DE | 04 /
Klug, Bastian Schwanallee 15a 35037 Marburg Hessen / DE | [2021/19] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/19] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 20206006.7 | 05.11.2020 | [2021/19] | Priority number, date | DE201910129833 | 05.11.2019 Original published format: DE102019129833 | [2021/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3819198 | Date: | 12.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62J9/25 | [2021/19] | CPC: |
B62J9/25 (EP);
B62J9/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ADAPTER ZUM ANBRINGEN VON GEGENSTAENDEN AM TANK EINES MOTORRADES | [2021/19] | English: | ADAPTER FOR ATTACHING OBJECTS TO THE TANK OF A MOTORCYCLE | [2021/19] | French: | ADAPTATEUR POUR ATTACHER DES OBJETS AU RÉSERVOIR D'UNE MOTO | [2021/19] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/17] | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2277768 (LOUKAIDES LEN [CN]) [X] 1-11,14,15 * the whole document *; | [X]CN201457587U (LEONIDIS LUKAIDIS) [X] 1-5,9,10,12,13 * the whole document *; | [X]DE3125460 (KAUF ALOIS) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1652761 (PLASTEX [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2004189042 (TANAX KK) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2371687 (HONDA ACCESS KK [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2289783 | DE102010037912 |