EP3831350 - WOUND CARE ARTICLE HAVING A SUBSTANTIALLY POLYGONAL OR ELLIPSOID MAIN SURFACE AND AT LEAST ONE RECESS ARRANGED ON ONE SIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSN medical GmbH Schützenstrasse 1-3 22761 Hamburg / DE | [2022/47] |
Former [2021/23] | For all designated states BSN medical GmbH Schützenstrasse 1-3 22761 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riesinger, Birgit Raesfeldstrasse 67 48149 Münster / DE | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/47] |
Former [2021/23] | FARAGO Patentanwälte Thierschstraße 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20206494.5 | 12.08.2014 | [2021/23] | Priority number, date | DE201320103639U | 12.08.2013 Original published format: DE 202013103639 U | DE201320103953U | 02.09.2013 Original published format: DE 202013103953 U | [2021/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3831350 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3831350 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/20, A61F13/00, A61F13/02, A61F13/06, A61F13/10, A61F13/14 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
A61F13/01038 (EP,US);
A61F13/00063 (EP,US);
A61F13/01012 (EP,US);
A61F13/01017 (US);
A61F13/01021 (EP,US);
A61F13/01029 (US);
A61F13/01042 (US);
A61F13/0209 (EP,US);
A61F13/022 (US);
A61F13/05 (EP,US);
A61F13/06 (EP,US);
A61F13/061 (US);
A61F13/064 (US);
A61F13/068 (US);
A61F13/10 (EP,US);
A61F13/122 (US);
A61F13/14 (EP,US);
A61F13/143 (US);
A61F13/148 (US);
A61F13/2002 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00476 (EP,US);
A61F2013/0048 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00489 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00497 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00502 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00574 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00578 (EP,US);
A61F2013/00748 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WUNDPFLEGEARTIKEL AUFWEISEND EINE IM WESENTLICHEN POLYGONALE ODER ELLIPOSIDE GRUNDFLÄCHE SOWIE MINDESTENS EINE AN EINER SEITE ANGEORDNETE AUSNEHMUNG | [2021/23] | English: | WOUND CARE ARTICLE HAVING A SUBSTANTIALLY POLYGONAL OR ELLIPSOID MAIN SURFACE AND AT LEAST ONE RECESS ARRANGED ON ONE SIDE | [2021/23] | French: | ARTICLE POUR LE SOIN DES PLAIES PRÉSENTANT UNE SURFACE DE BASE SENSIBLEMENT POLYGONALE OU ELLIPSOÏDALE ET AU MOINS UN ÉVIDEMENT PLACÉ SUR UN CÔTÉ | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14752300.5 / EP3033058 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 25.02.2022 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of representative | [2022/18] | deleted | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: {0} | [2022/25] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | IT | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | IE | 12.08.2023 | LU | 12.08.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
IT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 12.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
LU | 12.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | CZ | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | DK | 23.11.2022 | |
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | DK | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | ES | 23.11.2022 | |
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2875758 (FUZAK GEORGE T, et al) [A] 1,11,12 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]WO9205756 (SMITH & NEPHEW [GB]) [A] 1,2,4,5,11-13 * figures 1,2; claims 1,2,3,4,5,13 *; | [A]DE20207356U (RIESINGER BIRGIT [DE]) [A] 1-3,5,13,14 * page 1, lines 8-24 * * page 3, lines 1-12 * * page 4, lines 12-27 * * figures 8a,8b *; | [A]US2004049146 (KOLTE METTE IRENE [DK], et al) [A] 1,11-13 * figures 2-5 * * page 1, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,2,9-11 *; | [A]US2008294136 (KAWAKAMI HIKARI [JP], et al) [A] 1,13* figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]DE202012101743U (RIESINGER BIRGIT [DE]) [A] 1-14 * page 2, paragraphs 1,10,13 * * page 3, paragraphs 17,19,21 * * page 4, paragraphs 26-29 * * page 6, paragraph 48 * * page 8, paragraphs 71,73 * * page 9, paragraph 89 * * page 10, paragraphs 91,97,98 * * page 11, paragraph 109 * * figures 8,9,10,11,13,14,16-19,26 * | by applicant | WO0152780 | WO03094813 | EP1507498 | WO2007051599 | EP2004116 | EP2153807 |