EP3995592 - MULTIMERIC ISOTHERMAL NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION METHODS FOR POINT-OF-NEED DIAGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states midge medical GmbH Bessemerstraße 22 12103 Berlin / DE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riester, Markus Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Weidmann, Manfred Berlin / DE | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Stralauer Platz 34 10243 Berlin / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20206553.8 | 09.11.2020 | [2022/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995592 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6827, C12Q1/6844 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6827 (EP);
C12Q1/6844 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6827, C12Q2521/507, C12Q2522/101, C12Q2527/127, C12Q2537/143 (EP);
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2521/507, C12Q2522/101, C12Q2527/127, C12Q2537/143 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/51] |
Former [2022/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIPLE ISOTHERMALE NUKLEINSÄURE-AMPLIFIKATIONSVERFAHREN ZUR BEDARFSPUNKTANALYSE | [2022/19] | English: | MULTIMERIC ISOTHERMAL NUCLEIC ACID AMPLIFICATION METHODS FOR POINT-OF-NEED DIAGNOSIS | [2022/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'AMPLIFICATION ISOTHERME DE MULTIPLES ACIDES NUCLÉIQUES POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER SUR SITE | [2022/19] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/51] | 11.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005118853 (ASM SCIENT INC [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-10,14,15 * abstract * * examples 16-17 * * page 57, line 5 - page 59, line 23 * * page 64, line 2 - line 14 * * page 88, line 19 - line 28 * * page 212, line 16 * * claims 148-150,153,157-159 * [I] 2; | [X]WO2010141940 (ALERE SAN DIEGO INC [GB], et al) [X] 14 * abstract * * claims 1-2,22 *; | [X]EP2966177 (VETGENOMICS S L [ES]) [X] 14 * abstract * * claim 13 *; | [X]WO2016203019 (ALERE SWITZERLAND GMBH [CH]) [X] 14 * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 23 ** claims 33-34,93,94,106 * | by applicant | EP1759012 | EP1789012 | EP2336361 | - ZANOLISPOTO, Biosensors (Basel, (20120000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 18 - 43 | - LIT et al., Analyst, (20190000), vol. 144, no. 31, pages 31 - 67 | - HOSER et al., PLoS ONE, vol. 9, no. 11, page e112656 | - NOTOMI et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20000000), vol. 28, page e63 | - SABINO et al., Nature Comm., (20190000), vol. 10, page 5252 | - SKERRA, Nucleic Acids Res, (19920000), vol. 20, pages 3551 - 3554 | - HUANG et al., Microb Biotechnol, (20200000), vol. 13, pages 950 - 961 | - LU et al., Int J Mol Sci, (20200000), vol. 21 | - MA et al., Virus Res., (20170000), vol. 232, pages 34 - 40 | - ABD EL WAHED et al., "Suitcase lab for rapid detection of SARS-CoV-2 based on recombinase polymerase amplification assay", J. Clin. Virol. | - "N-gene", Database accession no. NC_045512 | - ALTMAN, D. G.BLAND, J. M, "Diagnostic tests 2: Predictive values", BMJ, (19940000), vol. 309, page 102 | - FOMSGAARDROSENSTIERNE, Euro Surveill, (20200300), vol. 25 |