EP3822203 - METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATED MOVEMENT OF PACKED GOODS BETWEEN PALLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cellumation GmbH Kleiner Ort 7 28357 Bremen / DE | [2022/41] |
Former [2021/20] | For all designated states Cellumation GmbH Hochschulring 20 28359 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URIARTE, CLAUDIO c/o Cellumation GmbH Linzer Strasse 5 28359 Bremen / DE | 02 /
KUZNETSOV, IVAN c/o Cellumation GmbH Linzer Strasse 5 28359 Bremen / DE | 03 /
BANDE FIRVIDA, MIGUEL c/o Cellumation GmbH Linzer Strasse 5 28359 Bremen / DE | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | RCD-Patent Giesen, Schmelcher & Griebel Patentwanwälte PartG mbB Kaiserstraße 100 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | RCD Patent Giesen, Schmelcher & Griebel Patentwanwälte PartG mbB Kaiserstraße 100 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 20206651.0 | 10.11.2020 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | LU20190101481 | 12.11.2019 Original published format: LU 101481 | [2021/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3822203 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3822203 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B65G57/03, B65G60/00, // B65G61/00 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
B65G60/00 (EP,CN);
B65G57/24 (CN);
B65G61/00 (EP,US);
B65G57/03 (EP);
B65G57/20 (CN);
G05B19/4155 (US);
G06Q10/08 (US);
B65G13/00 (US);
B65G2201/025 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN UMPALLETIERUNG VON PACKGUT | [2021/20] | English: | METHOD FOR THE AUTOMATED MOVEMENT OF PACKED GOODS BETWEEN PALLETS | [2021/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REPALETTISATION AUTOMATISÉE DES MARCHANDISES EMBALLÉES | [2021/20] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/20] | 23.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2023 | Observations by third parties | 27.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | MC | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SI | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | LU | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
LU | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
MC | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
IT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 09.08.2023 | |
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 09.08.2023 | |
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]JPS5030266 ; | by applicant | US3645379 | EP0276881 | CN1117928 | GB2348631 | US2007280814 | DE102009026388 | DE102010044239 | EP2349886 | EP2874923 | other | US2008260513 | US2009229953 | US2013037388 | US2021139259 |