EP3995719 - CONNECTION OF TWO ENDS OF A STRAP OR ONE END OF A STRAP AND ONE END OF ANOTHER STRAP, CONNECTOR FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A CONNECTION AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATO GmbH & Co. KG Benzstraße 16 - 24 63165 Mühlheim am Main / DE | [2022/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIEß, Michael 63456 Hanau / DE | 02 /
WILK, Thomas 63165 Mühlheim / DE | [2022/19] | Representative(s) | Franke, Markus, et al Patentanwälte Sturm Weilnau Franke Partnerschaft mbB Unter den Eichen 5 (Haus C-Süd) 65195 Wiesbaden / DE | [2022/19] | Application number, filing date | 20206706.2 | 10.11.2020 | [2022/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3995719 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16G3/08 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
F16G3/08 (EP,US);
F16G3/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNG ZWEIER ENDEN EINES GURTS ODER EINES ENDES EINES GURTS UND EINES ENDES EINES ANDEREN GURTS, VERBINDER ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN VERBINDUNG SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER SOLCHEN VERBINDUNG | [2022/19] | English: | CONNECTION OF TWO ENDS OF A STRAP OR ONE END OF A STRAP AND ONE END OF ANOTHER STRAP, CONNECTOR FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A CONNECTION AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING SUCH A CONNECTION | [2022/19] | French: | RACCORDEMENT DE DEUX EXTRÉMITÉS D'UNE COURROIE OU D'UNE EXTRÉMITÉ D'UNE COURROIE ET D'UNE EXTRÉMITÉ D'UNE AUTRE COURROIE, RACCORD DESTINÉ À LA FABRICATION D'UN TEL RACCORDEMENT AINSI QUE DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL RACCORDEMENT | [2022/19] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/17] | 16.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE4116084 (JAEGER ARNOLD [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-14 * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 18; figures 1-3 * [A] 15 [I] 7,8; | [I]US2002040841 (WINKELMAN JOHN H [US], et al) [I] 15* figures 8-11 *; | [XA]EP2090804 (MATO MASCH & METALLWAREN [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0027] , [0 29]; figures 1-3 * [A] 15; | [XAI]DE102013110027 (SIG TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-14 * paragraphs [0040] - [0045] - [ 0048] - [0054]; figures 1-4C * [A] 15 [I] 5,8 | by applicant | DE741665 | DE102011116633 |