EP3800270 - INHIBITORS OF MET AND IGSF1 FOR TREATING GASTRIC AND LUNG CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/14] | NOVEL BIOMARKER FOR PREDICTING SENSITIVITY TO MET INHIBITOR, AND USE THEREOF | ||
[2021/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wellmarker Bio Co., Ltd. 11th Fl., 88, Olympic-ro 43-gil Songpa-gu, Seoul 05505 / KR | [2021/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Dong Hoon 5F Convergence-innovation building Asan Institute for Life Science Asan Medical Center 88 Olympicro-43gil 138-736 Seoul / KR | 02 /
HONG, Seung Woo 5F Convergence-innovation building Asan Institute for Life Science Asan Medical Center 88 Olympicro-43gil 138-736 Seoul / KR | 03 /
MOON, Jai Hee 5F Convergence-innovation building Asan Institute for Life Science Asan Medical Center 88 Olympicro-43gil 138-736 Seoul / KR | 04 /
SHIN, Jae Sik 5F Convergence-innovation building Asan Institute for Life Science Asan Medical Center 88 Olympicro-43gil, Songpa-gu 138-736 Seoul / KR | 05 /
KIM, Seung Mi 5F Convergence-innovation building Asan Institute for Life Science Asan Medical Center 88 Olympicro-43gil, Songpa-gu 138-736 Seoul / KR | 06 /
LEE, Dae Hee 5F Convergence-innovation building Asan Institute for Life Science Asan Medical Center 88 Olympicro-43gil, Songpa-gu 138-736 Seoul / KR | 07 /
LEE, Eun Young 5F Convergence-innovation building Asan Institute for Life Science Asan Medical Center 88 Olympicro-43gil, Songpa-gu 138-736 Seoul / KR | 08 /
LEE, Seul 5F Convergence-innovation building Asan Institute for Life Science Asan Medical Center 88 Olympicro-43gil, Songpa-gu 138-736 Seoul / KR | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2021/14] | Application number, filing date | 20207150.2 | 29.07.2015 | [2021/14] | Priority number, date | KR20140096636 | 29.07.2014 Original published format: KR 20140096636 | [2021/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3800270 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3800270 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, A61K31/7088, A61P35/00 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6886 (US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K31/713 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/1138 (US);
C12Q1/68 (EP,US);
C12Y207/10001 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (US);
G01N33/57492 (US);
C12N2310/14 (US);
C12N2310/141 (US);
C12N2310/531 (US);
C12N2320/31 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] |
Former [2021/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN VON MET UND IGSF1 ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MAGEN- UND LUNGENKREBS | [2021/29] | English: | INHIBITORS OF MET AND IGSF1 FOR TREATING GASTRIC AND LUNG CANCER | [2021/29] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE MET ET IGSF1 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER DU POUMON ET DE L'ESTOMAC | [2021/29] |
Former [2021/14] | NEUARTIGER BIOMARKER ZUR VORHERSAGE DER EMPFINDLICHKEIT AUF EINEN MET-INHIBITOR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2021/14] | NOVEL BIOMARKER FOR PREDICTING SENSITIVITY TO MET INHIBITOR, AND USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2021/14] | NOUVEAU BIOMARQUEUR POUR PRÉDIRE LA SENSIBILITÉ À UN INHIBITEUR MET ET UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTE | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 18.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15828125.3 / EP3176269 | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2015 | AL | 27.10.2021 | AT | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | DK | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | MK | 27.10.2021 | MT | 27.10.2021 | NL | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | RS | 27.10.2021 | SE | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | TR | 27.10.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | GR | 28.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | PT | 28.02.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
TR | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 29.07.2015 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005095622 (VAN ANDEL RES INST [US], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]US2012100157 (VANDE WOUDE GEORGE F [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0011] *; | [A]WO2012119113 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0077] *; | [A]WO2012178128 (ONCOCYTE CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0226] *; | [A] - S. T. YOUNGER ET AL, "Transcriptional gene silencing in mammalian cells by miRNA mimics that target gene promoters", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20110322), vol. 39, no. 13, doi:10.1093/nar/gkr155, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 5682 - 5691, XP055007870 [A] 1-5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkr155 | by applicant | - WEINSTEIN-OPPENHEIMER et al., Pharma. . Therap., (20000000), vol. 88, pages 229 - 279 |