EP3875789 - SCREW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Precision Industrial Corp. No. 59-1, Ln. 2, Yongle St. Gangshan Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | [2023/28] |
Former [2021/36] | For all designated states Vertex Precision Industrial Corp. No. 59-1, Ln. 2, Yongle St. Gangshan Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, CHING-CHENG No. 59-1, Ln. 2, Yongle St., Gangshan Dist. Kaohsiung City / TW | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [2023/28] |
Former [2021/36] | Pallini Gervasi, Diego Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 20207172.6 | 12.11.2020 | [2021/36] | Priority number, date | TW20200202463U | 05.03.2020 Original published format: TW 109202463 U | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3875789 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3875789 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16B25/00, F16B25/10, // F16B5/02, F16B23/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
F16B25/0015 (EP);
F16B35/044 (US);
F16B25/0031 (EP);
F16B25/0078 (EP);
F16B25/10 (EP);
F16B23/0023 (EP);
F16B23/003 (EP);
F16B23/0092 (EP);
F16B25/0063 (EP);
F16B5/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] |
Former [2021/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHRAUBE | [2021/36] | English: | SCREW | [2021/36] | French: | VIS | [2021/36] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 09.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017108026 (YANG HUI-JU [TW]) [Y] 1-7 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0020] *; | [Y]US10054147 (HUBMANN GERHARD [AT]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 2,4 * * column 5, lines 63-66 ** column 6, lines 28-32 * |