EP4001506 - ARTIFICIAL LAWN SYSTEM COMPRISING HYDROPHOBIC SAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tarkett Sports Canada Inc. 7445 Cote-de-Liesse Suite 200 Montréal, Québec H4T 1G2 / CA | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morton-Finger, Jürgen 69469 Weinheim / DE | 02 /
Berghaus, Ulrich 53844 Troisdorf / DE | 03 /
Köhler, Christoph 69469 Weinheim / DE | 04 /
Röger-Göpfert, Cornelia 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20207347.4 | 13.11.2020 | [2022/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001506 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4001506 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E01C13/08 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
E01C13/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] |
Former [2022/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KUNSTRASENSYSTEM UMFASSEND HYDROPHOBEN SAND | [2022/21] | English: | ARTIFICIAL LAWN SYSTEM COMPRISING HYDROPHOBIC SAND | [2022/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GAZON ARTIFICIEL COMPRENANT DU SABLE HYDROPHOBIQUE | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/01] | 25.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/35] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004022853 (PV SAND AS [DK], et al) [I] 1,5,10-12,15 * the whole document *; | [I]US2004214000 (HUFF CARL L [US], et al) [I] 1,4-6,8,15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2007160800 (REDDICK RANDOLPH S [US]) [X] 1-5,13-15* paragraphs [0052] - [0054] *; | [XI]US2017319943 (LEYDS JOHN ANTHONY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8,15 * the whole document * [I] 5,7,9 |