EP3920347 - TUNABLE LASER SOURCE AND LIGHT STEERING APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Dongjae 16678, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
BYUN, Hyunil 16678, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
SHIN, Changgyun 16678, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/49] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2021/49] | Application number, filing date | 20207506.5 | 13.11.2020 | [2021/49] | Priority number, date | KR20200067314 | 03.06.2020 Original published format: KR 20200067314 | [2021/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920347 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/14, H01S5/065, // H01S3/08, H01S3/082, H01S3/083, H01S3/106, H01S5/06, H01S5/40 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
H01S5/0654 (EP,US);
H01S5/142 (EP,KR,US);
H01S5/14 (CN);
H01S3/10023 (CN,US);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S7/4814 (EP,US);
G01S7/4817 (EP,US);
G01S7/4818 (EP);
H01S3/0637 (US);
H01S3/08 (CN);
H01S3/106 (EP,CN,US);
H01S3/1301 (CN);
H01S3/136 (CN);
H01S5/0071 (CN,US);
H01S5/0612 (EP,US);
H01S5/1071 (US);
H01S5/143 (KR);
H01S3/08031 (EP,US);
H01S3/082 (EP,US);
H01S3/0826 (EP,US);
H01S3/083 (EP,US);
H01S5/021 (US);
H01S5/0218 (US);
H01S5/4006 (EP);
H01S5/4068 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] |
Former [2021/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSTIMMBARE LASERQUELLE UND LICHTABLENKVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2021/49] | English: | TUNABLE LASER SOURCE AND LIGHT STEERING APPARATUS INCLUDING THE SAME | [2021/49] | French: | SOURCE LASER ACCORDABLE ET APPAREIL DE DIRECTION DE LUMIÈRE LA COMPRENANT | [2021/49] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 27.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US9748726 (MORTON PAUL A [US], et al); | [Y]US2019056634 (HOSSEINI EHSAN [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2019191647 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]) |