EP3799909 - NASAL DELIVERY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTINOSE, INC. 1020 Stony Hill Road, Ste 300 Yardley, PA 19067 / US | [2022/45] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states Optinose AS Oslo Innovation Center Gaustadalléen 21 0349 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DJUPESLAND, Per Gisle c/o OPTINOSE AS Oslo Innovation Center Gaustadalléen 21 0349 Oslo / NO | 02 /
LECLERC, Michael c/o OPTINOSE AS Oslo Innovation Center Gaustadalléen 21 0349 Oslo / NO | 03 /
MAHMOUD, Ramy A c/o OPTINOSE AS Oslo Innovation Center Gaustadalléen 21 0349 Oslo / NO | 04 /
SIWINSKI, Shane c/o OPTINOSE AS Oslo Innovation Center Gaustadalléen 21 0349 Oslo / NO | 05 /
GORDON, Joseph c/o OPTINOSE AS Oslo Innovation Center Gaustadalléen 21 0349 Oslo / NO | 06 /
FISK, Justin c/o OPTINOSE AS Oslo Innovation Center Gaustadalléen 21 0349 Oslo / NO | [2021/14] | Representative(s) | Boden, Keith McMurray Vertus Professional Services Ltd 1 Highlands Road Reigate, RH2 0LA / GB | [2024/28] |
Former [2021/14] | Boden, Keith McMurray Vertus Professional Services ltd t/a Vertus 1 Highlands Road Reigate Surrey RH2 0LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20207667.5 | 25.02.2013 | [2021/14] | Priority number, date | US201261603095P | 24.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261603095 P | [2021/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3799909 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3799909 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/08, A61M15/00 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
A61M15/08 (EP,US);
A61M15/00 (RU);
A61M15/0018 (US);
A61M15/002 (EP,US);
A61M15/0021 (EP,US);
A61M15/009 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2021/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR NASALEN FREISETZUNG | [2021/14] | English: | NASAL DELIVERY DEVICES | [2021/14] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'ADMINISTRATION NASALE | [2021/14] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 27.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13711300.7 / EP2817052 | EP17190469.1 / EP3281664 | Divisional application(s) | EP24182327.7 / EP4406572 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO0051672 (DJUPESLAND PER GISLE [NO]); | [A]US6648848 (KELDMANN ERIK [DK], et al); | [A]US2008163874 (DJUPESLAND PER GISLE [NO]); | [XI]US2011088690 (DJUPESLAND PER GISLE [NO], et al); | [A]US2011259329 (DJUPESLAND PER GISLE [NO], et al); | [A]US2011318345 (DJUPESLAND PER GISLE [NO]) | by applicant | WO0051672 |