EP3821944 - SYSTEM FOR TRIGGERING AN IMAGING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthineers International AG Hinterbergstrasse 14 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [2023/19] |
Former [2021/20] | For all designated states Varian Medical Systems International AG Hinterbergstrasse 14 6312 Steinhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUNRO, Peter N Pigerstrasse 21 5405 Baden-Daettwil / CH | 02 /
GRIMM, Stefan Rohrstrasse 1 8952 Schlieren / CH | 03 /
ZWIKER, Raphael Hinterdorfstrasse 6 8115 Huttikon / CH | 04 /
SIDLER, Christof Schniderbuebliweg 27 5426 Lengnau / CH | [2021/20] | Representative(s) | Lee, Rabinder, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | Lee, Rabinder, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Communications House South Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middx. TW18 4PR / GB | Application number, filing date | 20208644.3 | 24.10.2014 | [2021/20] | Priority number, date | US201314062511 | 24.10.2013 Original published format: US201314062511 | [2021/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3821944 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2021/20] | CPC: |
A61N5/1064 (EP,US);
A61B6/54 (US);
A61B6/12 (US);
A61B6/52 (US);
A61B6/547 (US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] |
Former [2021/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM AUSLÖSEN EINES BILDGEBUNGSPROZESSES | [2024/26] | English: | SYSTEM FOR TRIGGERING AN IMAGING PROCESS | [2021/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉCLENCHEMENT D'UN PROCESSUS D'IMAGERIE | [2024/26] |
Former [2021/20] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSLÖSEN EINES BILDGEBUNGSPROZESSES | ||
Former [2021/20] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCLENCHEMENT D'UN PROCESSUS D'IMAGERIE | Examination procedure | 15.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 15.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14841327.1 / EP3060302 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005058237 (MORF DANIEL [CH]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0027] - [0032] - [0040]; figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [X]WO2005032647 (VARIAN MED SYS TECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * sentence 7 - sentence 21 *; | [X]WO2011021410 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1* paragraphs [0034] - [0038] - [0042] , [0051]; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2015059576 | EP20140841327 |