EP3825230 - COMPARTMENT CONTENT NOTIFICATION AND INSPECTION DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LU | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B/E Aerospace, Inc. 150 Oak Plaza Blvd. Winston-Salem, NC 27105 / US | [2023/14] |
Former [2021/21] | For all designated states B/E Aerospace, Inc. 150 Oak Plaza Blvd. Winston- Salem, NC 27105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOWTY, Mark B. 8424 Monticello Ridge Drive Rural Hall, NC 27045 / US | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/21] | Application number, filing date | 20208735.9 | 19.11.2020 | [2021/21] | Priority number, date | US201916688548 | 19.11.2019 Original published format: US201916688548 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3825230 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3825230 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/00, B64D45/00, B60Q3/80, B60Q3/225, B60Q9/00, B61D37/00, // B64D11/02, B64D9/00, B60R5/00, B61L15/00 | [2022/45] | CPC: |
B64D11/003 (EP,US);
B60Q3/225 (EP,US);
B60Q3/80 (EP);
B60Q9/00 (EP);
B61D37/00 (EP);
B64D11/0636 (US);
B64D45/00 (EP,US);
G01S13/88 (US);
H04W4/029 (US);
B60R5/003 (EP);
B61L15/0036 (EP);
B61L15/0081 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/21] | B64D11/00, B64D45/00, B60R5/00, B60Q3/225, B60Q9/00, B61D37/00, // B64D11/02, B64D9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/01] |
Former [2021/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRINCHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BENACHRICHTIGUNG UND INSPEKTION DES INHALTS EINES FACHS | [2022/45] | English: | COMPARTMENT CONTENT NOTIFICATION AND INSPECTION DEVICE AND METHOD | [2021/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET MÉTHODE DE NOTIFICATION ET D'INSPECTION DU CONTENU D'UN COMPARTIMENT | [2021/21] |
Former [2021/21] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BENACHRICHTIGUNG UND INSPEKTION DES INHALTS EINES FACHS | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/01] | 26.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.04.2023 | AT | 05.04.2023 | CZ | 05.04.2023 | DK | 05.04.2023 | EE | 05.04.2023 | ES | 05.04.2023 | FI | 05.04.2023 | HR | 05.04.2023 | IT | 05.04.2023 | LT | 05.04.2023 | LV | 05.04.2023 | MC | 05.04.2023 | NL | 05.04.2023 | PL | 05.04.2023 | RO | 05.04.2023 | RS | 05.04.2023 | SE | 05.04.2023 | SI | 05.04.2023 | SK | 05.04.2023 | SM | 05.04.2023 | NO | 05.07.2023 | GR | 06.07.2023 | IS | 05.08.2023 | PT | 07.08.2023 | LU | 19.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
MC | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SI | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2023 | ||
DK | 05.04.2023 | ||
EE | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RO | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
SK | 05.04.2023 | ||
SM | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
FI | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
LT | 05.04.2023 | ||
LV | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
HR | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
RS | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AL | 05.04.2023 | |
AT | 05.04.2023 | ||
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
GR | 06.07.2023 | ||
IS | 05.08.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 05.04.2023 | |
ES | 05.04.2023 | ||
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
SE | 05.04.2023 | ||
NO | 05.07.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 05.04.2023 | |
NL | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 07.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 05.04.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102012006840 (SBF SPEZIALLEUCHTEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 2* the whole document *; | [X]EP2910472 (ASTRONICS ADVANCED ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [X] 1,4-9,11,13,15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1A,B * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figure 3 *; | [A]EP3550497 (BE AEROSPACE INC [US]) [A] 2,3 * paragraph [0014] *; | [A]US2019308728 (MCKEE JEFFEREY M [US]) [A] 3 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058]; figure 10 *; | [X]US2019323281 (GHANNAM MAHMOUD YOUSEF [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8,13,14 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1A,B * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2, 3 *; | [XP]EP3686107 (ROCKWELL COLLINS INC [US]) [XP] 1,4-6,8-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054]; figure 3B * |