EP3839599 - METROLOGY SYSTEM WITH TRANSPARENT WORKPIECE SURFACE MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitutoyo Corporation 20-1, Sakado 1-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8533 / JP | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRYLL, Robert Kamil c/o Micro Encoder, Inc. 11533 Northeast 118th Street Kirkland, WA Washington 98034 / US | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 20209157.5 | 23.11.2020 | [2021/25] | Priority number, date | US201916720432 | 19.12.2019 Original published format: US201916720432 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3839599 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/36 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
G02B21/367 (EP,US);
G01N21/01 (CN);
H04N23/67 (US);
G01B11/24 (EP);
G01N21/88 (US);
G01N21/8806 (EP);
G01N21/8851 (CN);
G01N21/958 (EP);
G02B21/361 (US);
G02B21/368 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP);
G01N2021/0162 (CN);
G01N2021/0181 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METROLOGIESYSTEM MIT TRANSPARENTEM WERKSTÜCKOBERFLÄCHENMODUS | [2021/25] | English: | METROLOGY SYSTEM WITH TRANSPARENT WORKPIECE SURFACE MODE | [2021/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MÉTROLOGIE AVEC MODE DE SURFACE DE PIÈCE TRANSPARENTE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 14.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013100272 (PRICE JEFFREY H [US], et al) [X] 1,13 * abstract * * Table 1 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0012] , [0023] , [0133] , [0140] * * paragraphs [0073] , [0080] , [0083] * [I] 2-12,14-16; | [A] - MUHAMMAD M ET AL, "Sampling for Shape from Focus in Optical Microscopy", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, (20120301), vol. 34, no. 3, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2011.144, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 564 - 573, XP011490653 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2011.144 | [A] - RORY M. POWER ET AL, "Adaptable, illumination patterning light sheet microscopy", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20180625), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-018-28036-2, XP055738783 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-018-28036-2 | [A] - PIAZZA SIMONLUCA ET AL, "Enhanced volumetric imaging in 2-photon microscopy via acoustic lens beam shaping", JOURNAL OF BIOPHOTONICS, DE, vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1002/jbio.201700050, ISSN 1864-063X, (20170725), URL: https://api.wiley.com/onlinelibrary/tdm/v1/articles/10.1002%2Fjbio.201700050, XP055787772 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jbio.201700050 | by applicant | US6542180 | US7030351 | US7324682 | US7454053 | US7570795 | US7627162 | US8111905 | US8111938 | US8581162 | US9060117 | US9143674 | US9830694 |