EP4000707 - CONNECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING AN ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hurzig, André Engertstrasse 6a 04177 Leipzig / DE | For all designated states Zurek, Marco Bramschstr. 17 01159 Dresden / DE | [2023/27] |
Former [2022/21] | For all designated states Hurzig, André Engertstrasse 6a 04177 Leipzig / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | Gottfried, Hans-Peter Patentanwalt Messering 8f 01067 Dresden / DE | [2022/21] | Application number, filing date | 20209584.0 | 24.11.2020 | [2022/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4000707 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4000707 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/12, A63H33/10 | [2022/21] | CPC: |
A63H33/12 (EP);
F16B7/00 (US);
A63H33/101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINER BAUGRUPPE | [2022/21] | English: | CONNECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING AN ASSEMBLY | [2022/21] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONNEXION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE MONTAGE D'UN ENSEMBLE | [2022/21] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 26.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | [2024/32] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RO | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 12.07.2023 | |
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 12.07.2023 | |
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2560060 (PRIEUR ROGER [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-15; | [A]US4547160 (LABELLE RICHARD [CA]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 45; figure - *; | [A]US5061219 (GLICKMAN JOEL I [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 51 - column 5, line 63; figure - *; | [A]EP1064061 (LEGO AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-15* page 3, line 31 - page 13, line 16; figure - *; | [A]US2008207082 (WARNER TIMOTHY JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0191] - paragraph [0198]; figure - * | by applicant | DE2550502 | DE2902267 | DE8032117U | DE8218544U | DE3342366 | DE4000802 | DE9408051U | DE69111204T | DE10200298 | US2013109267 | DE102012017305 |