EP3831709 - QUICK-HEATING STRATEGY FOR BACKING UP AN AIRSHIP IN THE EVENT OF ITS SOLAR GENERATOR OVERHEATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles - Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2021/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RENAULT, Hervé THALES ALENIA SPACE France Boîte Postale 99 5 Allée des Gabians 06156 CANNES LA BOCCA CEDEX / FR | 02 /
PROST, Jean-Pierre THALES ALENIA SPACE France Boîte Postale 99 5 Allée des Gabians 06156 CANNES LA BOCCA CEDEX / FR | 03 /
MESRINE, Magali THALES ALENIA SPACE France Boîte Postale 99 5 Allée des Gabians 06156 CANNES LA BOCCA CEDEX / FR | [2021/23] | Representative(s) | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble Up On 25 Boulevard Romain Rolland CS 40072 75685 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Atout PI Laplace Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2021/23] | Marks & Clerk France Immeuble "Visium" 22, avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 20210123.4 | 26.11.2020 | [2021/23] | Priority number, date | FR20190013802 | 05.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1913802 | [2021/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3831709 | Date: | 09.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3831709 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B64B1/06, B64B1/38 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
B64B1/38 (EP);
B64B1/02 (CN,US);
B64B1/42 (US);
B60L8/003 (CN);
B64B1/06 (EP);
B64B1/40 (CN,US);
B64D27/24 (US);
B64D27/353 (EP,US);
B60L2200/10 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2021/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STRATEGIE ZUR SICHERUNG EINES LENKBAREN BALLONS IM FALLE DER ÜBERHITZUNG EINES SOLARGENERATORS | [2021/23] | English: | QUICK-HEATING STRATEGY FOR BACKING UP AN AIRSHIP IN THE EVENT OF ITS SOLAR GENERATOR OVERHEATING | [2021/23] | French: | STRATEGIE DE MISE EN SAUVEGARDE D'UN BALLON DIRIGEABLE EN CAS D'ECHAUFFEMENT DE SON GENERATEUR SOLAIRE | [2021/23] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 23.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6540178 (HILLSDON REGINALD H [GB]); | [A]US6609680 (PERRY WILLIAM DEAN [US], et al); | [A]US2015076281 (LASKARIS STYLIANOS [GR]); | [A]US2017019055 (BOULANGER BERTRAND [FR], et al); | [A]CN107979157 (48TH RES INST CHINA ELECTRONICS TECHNOLOGY GROUP CORP) |