EP3848704 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SENSING AND FOR IMPROVING SENSOR ACCURACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensyne Health Group Limited Schrödinger Building Heatley Road Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | [2021/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANGEL, Manuel Pinuela c/o Drayson Technologies (Europe) Limited Grand Union Studios 332 Ladbroke Grove London, Greater London W10 5AD / GB | 02 /
STEFAN, Diana c/o Drayson Technologies (Europe) Limited Grand Union Studios 332 Ladbroke Grove London, Greater London W10 5AD / GB | 03 /
WILSON, Padarn c/o Drayson Technologies (Europe) Limited Grand Union Studios 332 Ladbroke Grove London, Greater London W10 5AD / GB | [2021/28] | Representative(s) | Fraser, Thomas George, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/28] | Application number, filing date | 20210128.3 | 27.06.2017 | [2021/28] | Priority number, date | GB20160011154 | 27.06.2016 Original published format: GB 201611154 | [2021/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3848704 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00, G08B21/12, G08B29/20, G01D18/00 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
G01N33/0006 (EP,GB,US);
G01D18/002 (GB);
G01D18/00 (EP);
G01D18/008 (GB);
G01N33/0075 (EP,GB,US);
G08B21/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/07] |
Former [2021/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERFASSUNG UND VERBESSERUNG DER SENSORGENAUIGKEIT | [2021/28] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SENSING AND FOR IMPROVING SENSOR ACCURACY | [2021/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DÉTECTION ET D'AMÉLIORATION DE LA PRÉCISION DE CAPTEUR | [2021/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/07] | 12.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 24.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17745453.5 / EP3475664 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011316699 (ARUNACHALAM RAGHU [US]) [A] 1,12-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0022] , [0036] ** paragraphs [0029] , [0 30]; figure 4b *; | [XA]US2014200840 (COX SHANE [AU], et al) [X] 14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0068]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0078] , [0 80]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0086]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0098] * [A] 1,12,13; | [XAI]US2014278186 (HERZL DAVIDA [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,12,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17] , [0 26]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figure 5 * * paragraphs [0048] , [0050] - [0052] * [A] 14 [I] 3-8,10,11 | by applicant | CA94560 |