EP3855331 - SCREEN DISPLAYING PROGRAM, METHOD FOR SCREEN DISPLAYING, AND SCREEN DISPLAYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minato, Masako c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Horio, Kenichi c/o FUJITSU LABORATORIES OF AMERICA,INC. 1240 E. Arques Ave. M/S 345 Sunnyvale, CA California 94085 / US | 03 /
Kasanami, Masaaki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 20210617.5 | 30.11.2020 | [2021/30] | Priority number, date | JP20200008177 | 22.01.2020 Original published format: JP 2020008177 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3855331 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, G06F8/34 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G06F21/6245 (EP);
G06F21/629 (CN);
G06F21/6209 (US);
G06F16/254 (CN);
G06F16/535 (CN);
G06F21/32 (CN);
G06F21/6218 (CN);
G06F21/6254 (US);
G06F3/04817 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] |
Former [2021/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDSCHIRM-ANZEIGE-PROGRAMM, VERFAHREN ZUR BILDSCHIRM-ANZEIGE UND BILDSCHIRM-ANZEIGE-GERÄT | [2021/30] | English: | SCREEN DISPLAYING PROGRAM, METHOD FOR SCREEN DISPLAYING, AND SCREEN DISPLAYING APPARATUS | [2021/30] | French: | PROGRAMME D'AFFICHAGE D'ECRAN, PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE D'ECRAN ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE D'ECRAN | [2021/30] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 15.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2019362096 (BARDAY KABIR A [US]) [X] 1-3,5,9-11,13,15 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0123] * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0169] * [I] 4,6-8,12,14; | [A] - Anonymous, "Flow-based programming - Wikipedia", (20200104), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Flow-based_programming&oldid=934072640, (20210422), XP055798243 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 2 * | by applicant | JP2015064694 | JP2015153111 | JP2014534487 |