EP3835567 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING EGR, CONTROL ARRANGEMENT, INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, VEHICLE, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scania CV AB 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSLUND, Anders Skogsborgsvägen 30 647 31 Mariefred / SE | 02 /
JENSEN, Mathias Pimpelvägen 25 153 35 Järna / SE | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Scania CV AB Patents, GP 117kv 151 87 Södertälje / SE | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 20211144.9 | 02.12.2020 | [2021/24] | Priority number, date | SE20190051425 | 11.12.2019 Original published format: SE 1951425 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835567 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D41/14, F02D19/02, F02D35/02 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
F02D41/005 (EP,US);
F02D21/08 (SE);
F02D35/021 (EP);
F02D41/0027 (EP,US);
F02D41/0052 (SE);
F02D41/1446 (EP,SE,US);
F02D41/1498 (EP);
F02D2021/083 (SE);
F02D2041/0265 (SE);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/04] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EGR-STEUERUNG, STEUERUNGSANORDNUNG, VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR, FAHRZEUG, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARES MEDIUM | [2021/24] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING EGR, CONTROL ARRANGEMENT, INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE, VEHICLE, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE MEDIUM | [2021/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE RGE, AGENCEMENT DE COMMANDE, MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE, VÉHICULE, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/04] | 16.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3220832 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,9-13 * abstract ** claims 1, 4 *; | [Y]DE4326498 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 6 * abstract * * page 7, line 11 - line 29 *; | [XYI]US2008053419 (PIERPONT DAVID ANDREW [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7-13 * abstract * * claims 1, 6 * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0013] * [Y] 6 [I] 4,6; | [XYI]US2018355808 (DAVID FLORENT [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-13 * abstract * * claims 1, 6 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0070] * [Y] 6 [I] 4,6; | [XYI]EP3447270 (BOSCH CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9-13 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1 5, 6 * [Y] 6 [I] 4,6 |