EP3910255 - NEGATIVE PRESSURE PROTECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GrowTrend Biomedical Co., Ltd. 2F., No. 14, Gongye E. 4th Rd. East Dist. Hsinchu City / TW | [2021/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Ching-Liang Taoyuan City / TW | 02 /
OU, Pei-Yin New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
LIU, Yun-Yueh Miaoli County / TW | 04 /
PAN, Neng Yu New Taipei City / TW | [2021/46] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/46] | Becker, Eberhard Becker & Kurig Partnerschaft Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20211480.7 | 03.12.2020 | [2021/46] | Priority number, date | TW20200205832U | 13.05.2020 Original published format: TW 109205832 U | [2021/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3910255 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24F7/003, F24F7/06, F24F8/10, F24F13/02, A61G10/02 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
F24F8/10 (EP);
A61G10/02 (US);
A61G10/023 (EP);
F24F13/02 (EP);
F24F3/167 (US);
F24F7/003 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEGATIVDRUCKSCHUTZSYSTEM | [2021/46] | English: | NEGATIVE PRESSURE PROTECTION SYSTEM | [2021/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION À PRESSION NÉGATIVE | [2021/46] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 21.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/48] | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2898837 (SCARSELLI THOMAS L) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3875853 (PIELKENROOD SIMON) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]WO0222069 (IIT RES INST [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XAI]KR20180003314 (NIT KOREA CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0034] - [0037] - [0062] - [0083]; figures 2-4, 19 * [A] 2-5 [I] 6,7 |