EP4009507 - BATTERY STORAGE SYSTEM WITH TEMPERATURE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STABL Energy GmbH Rupert-Mayer-Strasse 44 81379 München / DE | [2022/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGER, Arthur 80687 München / DE | 02 /
RADOJCIC, Rene 80993 München / DE | [2022/23] | Representative(s) | Lohr, Jöstingmeier & Partner Junkersstraße 3 82178 Puchheim/München / DE | [2022/23] | Application number, filing date | 20211860.0 | 04.12.2020 | [2022/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4009507 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/483, H02J7/00 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
H02M7/483 (EP);
H02M1/0067 (US);
H02J7/00309 (EP);
H02J7/007194 (US);
H02M7/4835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIESPEICHERSYSTEM MIT TEMPERATURMANAGEMENT | [2022/23] | English: | BATTERY STORAGE SYSTEM WITH TEMPERATURE MANAGEMENT | [2022/23] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE DE BATTERIE À GESTION DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2022/23] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 17.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102012220388 (RHEINISCH WESTFÄLISCH TECH HOCHSCHULE AACHEN [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,13,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0016] , [0017] , [0023] , [0036] , [0037] * * claim 10 * [Y] 12,14 [I] 5,7-11; | [Y]EP3640656 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12 * paragraphs [0043] , [0044] *; | [Y]US2020307395 (SLEPCHENKOV MIKHAIL [US], et al) [Y] 14* figure 4 * | by applicant | US2012243279 | EP2442390 | US9502960 |