EP3882396 - STRUCTURAL JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.08.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hengelhoef Concrete Joints NV Hengelhoefstraat 158 Zone B1 3600 Genk / BE | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meuwissen, Dirk Korenstraat 7 3600 Genk / BE | 02 /
Klingeleers, Albert, Charles Stokkemerbaan 116 3650 Dilsen-Stokkem / BE | 03 /
Winters, Rene, Alice Hengelhoefstraat 162 3600 Genk / BE | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 20212272.7 | 27.02.2013 | [2021/38] | Priority number, date | GB20120003314 | 27.02.2012 Original published format: GB 201203314 | GB20120015277 | 28.08.2012 Original published format: GB 201215277 | GB20120020095 | 08.11.2012 Original published format: GB 201220095 | [2021/38] | Previously filed application, date | WO2013EP53849 | 27.02.2013 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3882396 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3882396 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E01C11/08, E01C11/14 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
E01C11/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
E01C11/04 (IL,US);
E01C11/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
E01D19/06 (IL,KR,US);
Y10T403/21 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/15] |
Former [2021/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DEHNUNGSFUGE | [2021/38] | English: | STRUCTURAL JOINT | [2021/38] | French: | JOINT DE DILATATION | [2021/38] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/15] | 07.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13708716.9 / EP2729619 | EP15161433.6 / EP2930268 | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 11.10.2023 | RS | 11.10.2023 | SM | 11.10.2023 | NO | 11.01.2024 | GR | 12.01.2024 | IS | 11.02.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | HR | 11.10.2023 | |
RS | 11.10.2023 | ||
NO | 11.01.2024 | ||
GR | 12.01.2024 | ||
IS | 11.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 12.01.2024 | |
IS | 11.02.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2300995 (TUFTS ROBERT B) [Y] 1,3,5-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US2632367 (MARTIN HENRY K) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4332504 (ARAI MOTONOSUKE) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3533077 (CREMER ALFRED) [Y] 3-9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2848581 (G S E [FR]) [A] 9* the whole document *; | [YA]DE102009054028 (OBELODE SABINE [DE]) [Y] 1,3-9 * the whole document * [A] 2 |