EP3835985 - A SURVEILLANCE METHOD FOR DATA PASSING THROUGH A USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.07.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 111, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states ORANGE 111, quai du Président Roosevelt 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2021/24] | For all designated states ORANGE 78 rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEDJELMACI, Hichem ORANGE GARDENS - TGI/OLR/IPL/PATENTS - 44 avenue de la République - CS 50010 92326 CHÂTILLON CEDEX / FR | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 20212449.1 | 08.12.2020 | [2021/24] | Priority number, date | FR20190014270 | 12.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1914270 | [2021/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835985 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/55, G06F21/56, H04L29/06 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
G06F21/552 (EP);
H04L63/1416 (US);
G06F21/56 (EP);
H04L63/1408 (EP);
H04L63/1425 (US);
H04L63/1433 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/03] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINE VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON DATEN DIE DURCH EIN NUTZERGERÄT GELEITET WERDEN | [2021/24] | English: | A SURVEILLANCE METHOD FOR DATA PASSING THROUGH A USER EQUIPMENT | [2021/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE DE DONNÉES TRANSITANT PAR UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/03] | 15.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3226169 (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SOLUTIONS LTD [IE]); | [XI]US2019163900 (ZHANG ZHENG [US], et al); |