EP4012878 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR BALANCING CHARGE OF BATTERY CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vito Boeretang 200 2400 Mol / BE | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COENEN, Peter 2400 Mol / BE | 02 /
FEKRIASL, Sajjad 2400 Mol / BE | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20212547.2 | 08.12.2020 | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4012878 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
H02J7/00716 (EP);
H02J7/0016 (EP,US);
H02J7/0018 (EP);
H02J7/0019 (US);
H02J7/0048 (US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,US);
H02J2207/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM AUSGLEICHEN DER LADUNG VON BATTERIEZELLEN | [2022/24] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR BALANCING CHARGE OF BATTERY CELLS | [2022/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'ÉQUILIBRAGE DE CHARGE DE CELLULES DE BATTERIE | [2022/24] | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/22] | 16.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2012161709 (FUJII HIROKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0075] * * figure 1 * [A] 11; | [A]US2014239908 (ICHIKAWA KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0071] * * figures 7,8 *; | [YA]US2015081237 (YE CHANGQING [US], et al) [Y] 1-10,12-15 * abstract * [A] 11; | [A]WO2019030717 (GREY ORANGE PTE LTD [SG]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US8098048 |