EP3842666 - ELECTRIC POWERTRAIN WITH TWO CLUTCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO EMBRAYAGES 81 avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens / FR | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOREMUS, Olivier C/O VALEO EMBRAYAGES Immeuble Le Delta 14 Avenue des BEGUINES 95892 CERGY PONTOISE / FR | 02 /
GUINOT, Thierry C/o VALEO EMBRAYAGES Sce Propriété Intellectuelle Immeuble Le Delta 14 avenue des BEGUINES 95892 CERGY PONTOISE / FR | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Valeo Powertrain Systems Service Propriété Intellectuelle Immeuble le Delta 14, avenue des Béguines 95892 Cergy Pontoise / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Mazurais, Ronan Valeo Embrayages Sce Propriété Intellectuelle Immeuble Le Delta 14 avenue des Béguines 95892 Cergy Pontoise / FR | Application number, filing date | 20212872.4 | 09.12.2020 | [2021/26] | Priority number, date | FR20190015632 | 26.12.2019 Original published format: FR 1915632 | [2021/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3842666 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16H57/04 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
F16H57/0424 (EP);
F16H3/001 (CN);
B60K1/00 (EP,CN);
B60K17/02 (CN);
B60K17/06 (CN);
F16D25/083 (CN);
F16D25/10 (CN);
F16D25/123 (CN);
F16D25/14 (CN);
F16H57/043 (EP,CN);
F16H57/0471 (EP,CN);
F16H57/0473 (CN);
H02K5/04 (CN);
H02K5/1732 (CN);
H02K7/108 (CN);
B60K2001/001 (EP);
F16H2057/02034 (CN);
F16H2200/0021 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER ANTRIEB MIT ZWEI KUPPLUNGEN | [2021/26] | English: | ELECTRIC POWERTRAIN WITH TWO CLUTCHES | [2021/26] | French: | GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR ELECTRIQUE A DEUX EMBRAYAGES | [2021/26] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 08.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE112011105075T (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [XAYI]WO2016120472 (GKN DRIVELINE INT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP3109513 (DANA AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS GROUP [US]); | [Y]US9657826 (MORGAN THOMAS [US]); | [Y]US9719584 (DUAN FUHAI [CN], et al) | by applicant | DE102016202723 | FR20190001916 |