EP3858677 - STEP ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.09.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC, TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEXTER Systems 13 Route de la Minière 78034 Versailles Cedex / FR | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIRIA, Samuel c/o NEXTER Systems - Service Brevets - 7 route de Guerry CS 90328 18023 BOURGES / FR | 02 /
LASHERMES, Anne-Claire c/o NEXTER Systems - Service Brevets - 7 route de Guerry CS 90328 18023 BOURGES / FR | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 20213006.8 | 10.12.2020 | [2021/31] | Priority number, date | FR20200000770 | 28.01.2020 Original published format: FR 2000770 | [2021/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858677 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3858677 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60R3/02 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
B60R3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] |
Former [2021/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRITTSTUFENANORDNUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2021/31] | English: | STEP ASSEMBLY FOR VEHICLES | [2021/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MARCHEPIED POUR VÉHICULE | [2021/31] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 04.02.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.09.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 02.11.2022 | AT | 02.11.2022 | CY | 02.11.2022 | DK | 02.11.2022 | EE | 02.11.2022 | FI | 02.11.2022 | HR | 02.11.2022 | LT | 02.11.2022 | LV | 02.11.2022 | MC | 02.11.2022 | MK | 02.11.2022 | PL | 02.11.2022 | RO | 02.11.2022 | RS | 02.11.2022 | SI | 02.11.2022 | SK | 02.11.2022 | SM | 02.11.2022 | TR | 02.11.2022 | IE | 10.12.2022 | LU | 10.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | NO | 02.02.2023 | GR | 03.02.2023 | IS | 02.03.2023 | PT | 02.03.2023 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CY | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
MK | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
CY | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SI | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
IT | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
IT | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
IT | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SK | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IT | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 02.11.2022 | |
AT | 02.11.2022 | ||
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IT | 10.12.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RO | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
IT | 10.12.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
EE | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
DK | 02.11.2022 | ||
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
SM | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
HR | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
PL | 02.11.2022 | ||
RS | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
IS | 02.03.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
LV | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
GR | 03.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 02.11.2022 | |
FI | 02.11.2022 | ||
LT | 02.11.2022 | ||
NO | 02.02.2023 | ||
PT | 02.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 02.11.2022 | |
NO | 02.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US608617 (THOMAS MILLE X) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 *; | [A]US2246986 (PHILLIP PELLEGRINI) [A] 1-7 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE1220276 (FORD WERKE AG) [A] 1-7* figure 3 *; | [A]US3807757 (NEWPORT A, et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 2,3 *; | [A]JP2016064673 (WAKO KOGYO KK) [A] 1-7 * figure 4 * | Examination | US5941342 | by applicant | EP2072337 |