EP3835436 - ZEOLITE COMPOSITION SUITABLE FOR TANNING LEATHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smit Tanning B.V. Nijverheidslaan 48 1382 LK Weesp / NL | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDRIKSEN, Wouter Egbert-Jan Nijverheidslaan 48 1382 LK Weesp / NL | 02 /
VON BEHR, Dirick Jobst Alexander Nijverheidslaan 48 1382 LK Weesp / NL | 03 /
WILGENBURG, Pim Jan-Willem Nijverheidslaan 48 1382 LK Weesp / NL | [2021/49] |
Former [2021/24] | 01 /
Hendriksen, Wouter Egbert-Jan Nijverheidslaan 48 1382 LK Weesp / NL | ||
02 /
von Behr, Dirick Jobst Alexander Nijverheidslaan 48 1382 LK Weesp / NL | |||
03 /
Wilgenburg, Pim Jan-Willem Nijverheidslaan 48 1382 LK Weesp / NL | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 20213112.4 | 10.12.2020 | [2021/24] | Priority number, date | NL20192024455 | 13.12.2019 Original published format: NL 2024455 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835436 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3835436 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C14C3/02, C14C3/04, C01B39/02 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
C14C3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUM GERBEN VON LEDER GEEIGNETE ZEOLITHZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2021/24] | English: | ZEOLITE COMPOSITION SUITABLE FOR TANNING LEATHER | [2021/24] | French: | COMPOSITION DE ZÉOLITE ADAPTÉE AU TANNAGE DU CUIR | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 11.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 20.07.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | CY | 20.07.2022 | CZ | 20.07.2022 | EE | 20.07.2022 | FI | 20.07.2022 | HR | 20.07.2022 | LT | 20.07.2022 | LV | 20.07.2022 | MC | 20.07.2022 | MK | 20.07.2022 | RO | 20.07.2022 | RS | 20.07.2022 | SE | 20.07.2022 | SK | 20.07.2022 | SM | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.10.2022 | GR | 21.10.2022 | IS | 20.11.2022 | IE | 10.12.2022 | LU | 10.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MC | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
MK | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
CY | 20.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
IE | 10.12.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
LU | 10.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 20.07.2022 | |
CZ | 20.07.2022 | ||
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 20.07.2022 | |
EE | 20.07.2022 | ||
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SK | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 20.07.2022 | |
FI | 20.07.2022 | ||
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RO | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
SM | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
IS | 20.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
HR | 20.07.2022 | ||
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
GR | 21.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
LV | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 20.07.2022 | |
LT | 20.07.2022 | ||
RS | 20.07.2022 | ||
SE | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002038478 (CROSSLEY PAUL EDWARD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] ** paragraphs [0038] - [0056] *; | [AD]WO2013045764 (KEMIRA OYJ [FI]) [AD] 1-15 * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 25 * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 30 * * figure 2; examples 10-12; claims 7,13,16 *; | [A]US2018094330 (VAN DER BURGH STEFAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - [0036] - [0044] - [0068] * * paragraphs [0122] , [0123] , [0129] * * paragraphs [0137] - [0145] - [0154] - [0163]; example 2 * | by applicant | WO2013045764 | WO2013114414 | - WANG et al., JALCA, (20170000), vol. 112, page 224 |