EP3809195 - BENDABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.10.2022 [2022/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Guangli 267 River Bend Rd. Berkeley Heights, NJ New Jersey 07922 / US | 02 /
JOSHI, Dhananjay 13 Pond Crest Painted Post, NY New York 14870 / US | 03 /
PARK, Eunyoung 4 Woodsview Drive Elmira, NY New York 14903 / US | 04 /
QAROUSH, Yousef Kayed 6 Tara Place Painted Post, NY New York 14870 / US | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2021/16] | Application number, filing date | 20213137.1 | 13.10.2016 | [2021/16] | Priority number, date | US201562240879P | 13.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562240879 P | US201662290701P | 03.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662290701 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809195 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, B32B17/06, // B32B17/00, B32B27/06, B32B27/28, B32B27/36, B32B7/12 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
G02F1/1333 (EP);
G02F1/133305 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10K59/12 (EP,CN,KR);
H10K50/8426 (US);
B32B17/00 (EP,CN,US);
B32B17/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B27/06 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (CN);
B32B27/281 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (EP,CN,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,CN,US);
G02F1/133308 (CN,US);
G09F9/301 (CN);
H10K59/8722 (EP,CN,KR);
B32B2250/40 (EP,US);
B32B2250/44 (EP,US);
B32B2264/101 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,US);
B32B2307/546 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/558 (KR);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
B32B2457/20 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2457/202 (CN);
B32B2457/206 (CN);
C09K2323/00 (US);
C09K2323/03 (US);
G02F1/133331 (US);
G02F1/13338 (US);
G02F1/133528 (US);
H10K2102/311 (US);
H10K50/86 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BIEGFÄHIGES MODUL EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2021/16] | English: | BENDABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE MODULE | [2021/16] | French: | MODULE DE DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUVANT FLÉCHIR | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 28.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16794781.1 / EP3362850 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015210588 (CHANG THERESA [US], et al) |