EP4011720 - AN ELECTRIC MACHINE FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2022/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLKESSON, Johan 511 62 SKENE / SE | [2022/24] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 2096 403 12 Göteborg / SE | [2022/24] | Application number, filing date | 20213335.1 | 11.12.2020 | [2022/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4011720 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4011720 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60T1/08, B60T1/087, B60T1/093, B60T1/12, F16D57/00, F16D57/02, F16D57/06, H02K5/12, H02K7/10, H02K7/102 | [2022/24] | CPC: |
B60T1/08 (EP);
H02K7/10 (CN,US);
B60T1/087 (EP);
B60T1/093 (EP);
B60T1/12 (EP,US);
F16D57/00 (EP);
F16D57/04 (US);
F16D65/78 (US);
H02K1/276 (CN);
H02K17/32 (CN);
H02K5/12 (EP);
H02K7/1008 (EP);
H02K7/102 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] |
Former [2022/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2022/24] | English: | AN ELECTRIC MACHINE FOR A VEHICLE | [2022/24] | French: | MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2022/24] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 18.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | MC | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008035440 (HOELLER HEINZ [DE]); | [A]DE102018103592 (KA GROUP AG [CH]); | [A]DE102019202849 (THYSSENKRUPP AG [DE]) | by applicant | WO9324985 |