EP3835856 - DISPLAY APPARATUS HAVING DISPLAY MODULE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do Suwon-si 16677 / KR | [2021/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIN, Seonghwan c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Sungsoo c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
OH, Pilyong c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
LEE, Kwangjae c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
HAN, Jeongin c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 16677 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2021/24] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/24] | Application number, filing date | 20213436.7 | 11.12.2020 | [2021/24] | Priority number, date | KR20190167071 | 13.12.2019 Original published format: KR 20190167071 | KR20200038840 | 31.03.2020 Original published format: KR 20200038840 | [2021/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3835856 | Date: | 16.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, H01L25/075, H01L33/52, H01L33/62 | [2021/24] | CPC: |
H01L25/0753 (EP);
H01L27/156 (CN);
H01L25/167 (US);
G02F1/13336 (EP);
G09F9/33 (CN);
H01L25/162 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT ANZEIGEMODUL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/24] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS HAVING DISPLAY MODULE AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2021/24] | French: | AFFICHEUR DOTÉ D'UN MODULE D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/24] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 24.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010056288 (GLOBAL OLED TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 19 - page 20 *; | [A]US2014170387 (KASHIMA IZURU [JP], et al) [A] 1,14 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] ** figure 1; claims 1-6 *; | [XI]EP3343551 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,8,12-14 * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0206] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0094] * * figures 7,12-15 * [I] 3,5-7,9-11,15; | [A]US2018233494 (TAKEYA MOTONOBU [KR]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2E * * paragraph [0058] * * claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP3477699 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] * * figures 1-16; claims 1-15 * |