EP3842881 - DISTRIBUTED MOTOR CONTROL SYSTEM, MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE, AND DISTRIBUTED MOTOR CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMURA, Isamu c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 20213742.8 | 14.12.2020 | [2021/26] | Priority number, date | JP20190231776 | 23.12.2019 Original published format: JP 2019231776 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3842881 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/414 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
G05B19/4141 (EP);
H02M7/493 (CN);
G05B19/4155 (US);
H02P5/74 (CN);
G05B2219/33154 (EP);
G05B2219/33273 (EP);
G05B2219/34013 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/05] |
Former [2021/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR VERTEILTEN MOTORSTEUERUNG, MOTORSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERTEILTEN MOTORSTEUERUNG | [2021/26] | English: | DISTRIBUTED MOTOR CONTROL SYSTEM, MOTOR CONTROL DEVICE, AND DISTRIBUTED MOTOR CONTROL METHOD | [2021/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR DISTRIBUÉ, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MOTEUR DISTRIBUÉ | [2021/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/05] | 23.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/09] | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013041510 (KURAKAKE MITSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0023] - [0041]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2016239008 (TANAKA YUSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0091]; figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2018109207 (OKA YUSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0078]; figures 1-9 *; | [X]US2019384260 (GLOW STEPHEN [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0055]; figures 1-5, 10, 11 * | by applicant | JP2008178236 |