EP3808562 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A FLOOR COVERING PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unilin, BV Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAEYAERT, Christophe Weststraat 3A 8490 Jabbeke / BE | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Unilin Technologies Patent Department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Schacht, Benny Marcel Corneel Flooring Industries Limited, SARL Patent department Ooigemstraat 3 8710 Wielsbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 20213907.7 | 31.07.2015 | [2021/16] | Priority number, date | US201462031554P | 31.07.2014 Original published format: US 201462031554 P | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3808562 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B38/14, B32B38/06, // B32B37/20, B32B27/08, B30B5/06, B44C1/24, B44C5/04, E04F15/10 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
B30B5/06 (EP,US);
B32B7/10 (RU);
B32B37/1027 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B37/203 (EP,US);
B29C43/22 (US);
B29C43/48 (US);
B29C48/0021 (EP,US);
B32B17/10 (RU);
B32B21/08 (RU);
B32B27/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/18 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/22 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B27/304 (EP,CN,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B32B27/36 (CN);
B32B27/40 (EP,CN,US);
B32B33/00 (CN,RU);
B32B37/04 (EP,CN,RU,US);
B32B37/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B37/10 (EP,US);
B32B37/1009 (KR);
B32B37/153 (KR);
B32B37/24 (EP,CN,US);
B32B38/0004 (KR);
B32B38/06 (EP,CN,US);
B32B38/145 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B5/02 (EP,CN,US);
B32B5/022 (EP,CN,US);
B32B5/028 (EP,CN,US);
B44C1/24 (EP,US);
B44C5/04 (EP,US);
E04C2/18 (RU);
E04F13/18 (RU);
E04F15/02 (RU);
E04F15/02038 (US);
E04F15/10 (RU);
E04F15/102 (EP,CN,KR,US);
E04F15/105 (EP,CN,US);
E04F15/107 (EP,CN,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C2043/483 (US);
B29C59/046 (EP,US);
B29L2031/732 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0028 (KR);
B32B2262/101 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2264/067 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2305/08 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2305/22 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2305/30 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/414 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/514 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/554 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/734 (EP,US);
B32B2307/75 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2309/105 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2315/08 (EP,US);
B32B2315/085 (EP,US);
B32B2317/16 (EP,US);
B32B2327/06 (EP,US);
B32B2419/04 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2471/00 (EP,CN,US);
B32B37/0053 (EP,US);
B32B37/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] |
Former [2021/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BODENBELAGPRODUKTS | [2021/16] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A FLOOR COVERING PRODUCT | [2021/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN PRODUIT DE REVÊTEMENT DE SOL | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 15.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15767279.1 / EP3174711 | EP19151919.8 / EP3489016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2010055420 (VERMEULEN BRUNO PAUL LOUIS [BE]); | [XAI]WO2012001109 (SPANOLUX N V DIV BALTERIO [BE], et al) | by applicant | WO9747834 | EP1026341 | WO2013179261 | WO2014058464 | BE20140000517 |