EP4015857 - DEVICE FOR REVERSIBLY CONNECTING A MIXING TOOL TO A MIXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Healthcare Diagnostics Products GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klingelhoefer, Armin 35075 GLADENBACH / DE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Siemens Healthineers Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 20214036.4 | 15.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015857 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4015857 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16D1/116, F16D1/08, B01F27/213 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
F16D1/116 (EP);
B01F27/213 (EP);
F16D1/0847 (EP);
F16D2001/102 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | F16D1/116, B01F1/00, B01F7/00, B01F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REVERSIBLEN VERBINDUNG EINES RÜHRWERKZEUGES MIT EINEM RÜHRWERK | [2022/25] | English: | DEVICE FOR REVERSIBLY CONNECTING A MIXING TOOL TO A MIXER | [2022/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RACCORDEMENT RÉVERSIBLE D'UN OUTIL AGITATEUR DOTÉ D'UN AGITATEUR | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2022 | Examination requested [2022/52] | 18.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 04.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | MC | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | LU | 15.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
DK | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 13.09.2023 | |
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0175088 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-16 * page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 22; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE202010014935U (ELEKTROWERKZEUGE GMBH EIBENSTOCK [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2016170275 (DENAIFFE CATHERINE [FR]) [A] 1,15,16* page 1, line 33 - page 3, line 9; figures 1-4 * |