EP4015357 - NAVIGATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FQ IP AB August Barks gata 1 421 32 Västra Frölunda Västra Götalands Iän / SE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Augustsson, Per 421 32 Västra Frölunda / SE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20214305.3 | 15.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015357 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D53/00, B62D63/02, B62D61/12, B62D47/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
B62D53/005 (EP,KR);
B62D63/02 (EP,KR);
B60P3/06 (US);
B60L50/60 (US);
B62D47/006 (EP,KR,US);
B62D61/12 (EP,KR);
B62D63/025 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAVIGATOR | [2022/25] | English: | NAVIGATOR | [2022/25] | French: | NAVIGATEUR | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102013020833 (GRENZEBACH MASCHB GMBH [DE]); | [XAI]WO2020089170 (FQ IP AB [SE]) |