EP4015472 - DEVICE, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE MOUTH OF A HOLLOW GLASS PREFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHOTT Pharma AG & Co. KGaA Hattenbergstraße 10 55122 Mainz / DE | For all designated states SCHOTT Pharma Schweiz AG St. Josefen-Strasse 20 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2023/40] |
Former [2023/04] | For all designated states SCHOTT Pharma AG & Co. KGaA Hattenbergstraße 10 55122 Mainz / DE | ||
Former [2022/25] | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstraße 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jud, Xaver 9217 Neukirch a.d. Thur / CH | 02 /
Oberhänsli, Roman 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 03 /
Kummer, Hanspeter 79379 Müllheim / DE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20214318.6 | 15.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015472 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03B23/09, C03B23/045, B65D1/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
C03B23/092 (EP);
C03B23/045 (EP);
B65D1/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG, VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG DER MÜNDUNG EINES HOHLKÖRPERFÖRMIGEN VORPRODUKTES AUS GLAS | [2022/25] | English: | DEVICE, APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FORMING THE MOUTH OF A HOLLOW GLASS PREFORM | [2022/25] | French: | AGENCEMENT, DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMAGE DE L'ORIFICE D'UN PRÉCURSEUR DE VERRE EN FORME DE CORPS CREUX | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 13.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]DE102017011991 (NIPRO CORP [JP]) [I] 14,15 * paragraph [0050]; figure 7 *[A] 1-13; | [XI]US2020354255 (GERBER MAURO [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,7,10-13 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0076]; figures 5b,5c * [I] 4,6,8,9,14,15 | by applicant | DE102015111993 | DE102015117422 |