EP4015047 - MASK WITH DETACHABLE EARRINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanorex Co., Ltd. 9th, 5th floor, Dongsuwon-ro 551beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16503 / KR | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Chan Bong 165-04 Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
LEE, Jeong Ae 165-04 Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
LEE, Ye Ji 165-04 Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20214525.6 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015047 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/08, A41D13/11 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
A62B18/084 (EP);
A41D13/1107 (EP);
A41D13/1161 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASKE MIT ABNEHMBAREN OHRRINGEN | [2022/25] | English: | MASK WITH DETACHABLE EARRINGS | [2022/25] | French: | MASQUE AVEC BOUCLES D'OREILLE AMOVIBLES | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2021 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2758442 (YAMAMOTO KOGAKU [JP]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * figures 10-12 *; | [XI]GB2450437 (CHIU CHUN-LIANG [TW]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * figures 1-12 * [I] 3,8,10; | [XI]WO2011007957 (HONG WAN KI [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * figures 1-23 * [I] 3,8-10; | [X]EP2425875 (WOO JAE JONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-6,9,10 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2014175752 (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ]) [A] 8* figure 22 *; | [A]WO2015151019 (FISHER & PAYKEL HEALTHCARE LTD [NZ]) [A] 8 * figures 1-5,70-81 *; | [XI]KR20170104196 (NEOMED CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2,8 * [I] 6,9,10 |