EP3851161 - ADJUSTABLE ILLUMINATOR FOR PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY AND DIAGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUSA Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 29 Dunham Road Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOYAJIAN, Thomas DUSA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 29 Dunham Road Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | 02 /
CAROTA, Mark DUSA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 29 Dunham Road Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | 03 /
MAZEJKA, Brian DUSA PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 29 Dunham Road Billerica, Massachusetts 01821 / US | [2021/29] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/29] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20214586.8 | 12.10.2016 | [2021/29] | Priority number, date | US201562241902P | 15.10.2015 Original published format: US 201562241902 P | [2021/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3851161 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2021/29] | CPC: |
A61N5/062 (EP,US);
A61B5/0064 (US);
A61B5/0082 (US);
A61N2005/0626 (US);
A61N2005/0633 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0642 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0651 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0652 (US);
A61N2005/0662 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] |
Former [2021/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINSTELLBARE BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR PHOTODYNAMISCHE THERAPIE UND DIAGNOSE | [2021/29] | English: | ADJUSTABLE ILLUMINATOR FOR PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY AND DIAGNOSIS | [2021/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE RÉGLABLE POUR DIAGNOSTIC ET THÉRAPIE PHOTODYNAMIQUE | [2021/29] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 18.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16787667.1 / EP3362145 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9309847 (LARSEN ERIK [CH]) [I] 1-13 * p. 4, first full par. - p. 6, top par. * * figure 1 *; | [I]DE69827286T (VIRULITE LTD [GB]) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0043] - [0047] ** figures 5-7 *; | [I]US2006241726 (WHITEHURST COLIN [GB]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0067] - [0070] * * figures 1, 2a, 2b *; | [XI]WO2007112427 (TOBIN STEPHEN M [US]) [X] 1-8,10-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 25] - [0027] - [0 33] - [0040] * * figures 2, 3A, 3B, 9, 11 * [I] 9; | [XI]US2011106222 (WILSON BRIAN [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,10-13 * paragraphs [0119] - [0125] - [ 136] , [ 137] * * figures 3, 17 * [I] 8,9; | [I]WO2011124912 (DOUGAL GORDON REX PATERSON [GB]) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * page 10, lines 16-25 * * figures 1A, 1C * * page 7, lines 4-9 * | by applicant | US6223071 | US6709446 | US7190109 | WO2007112427 | US7723910 | US8030836 | US8216289 | US8758418 |