EP4015641 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A FILAMENTOUS FUNGUS WHOLE BROTH ENZYME COMPOSITION WITH LOW BIOMASS FORMATION AND HIGH PROTEIN YIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAMAUF, Christian 81241 München / DE | 02 /
CLAREN, Jörg 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Graser, Konstanze Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH IPM / Patent & License Management Arabellastrasse 4a 81925 München / DE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20214602.3 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015641 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/02, C12N1/14, C12N9/24, C12N15/63, C12P21/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
C12P19/02 (EP);
C12P21/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/37 (EP);
C12N1/14 (EP);
C12N15/80 (EP);
C12N9/0006 (EP);
C12N9/0071 (EP);
C12N9/24 (EP);
C12N9/2405 (EP);
C12N9/2437 (EP);
C12N9/2445 (EP,US);
C12N9/248 (EP);
C12P19/14 (EP);
C12P21/02 (EP);
C12Y302/01021 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FILAMENTÖSEN PILZ-VOLLBRÜHE-ENZYM-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT GERINGER BIOMASSEBILDUNG UND HOHER PROTEINAUSBEUTE | [2022/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A FILAMENTOUS FUNGUS WHOLE BROTH ENZYME COMPOSITION WITH LOW BIOMASS FORMATION AND HIGH PROTEIN YIELD | [2022/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE COMPOSITION D'ENZYME DE BOUILLON COMPLET DE CHAMPIGNON FILAMENTEUX AYANT UNE FAIBLE FORMATION DE BIOMASSE ET UN RENDEMENT PROTÉIQUE ÉLEVÉ | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/24] | 01.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2023/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2012125925 (DANISCO US INC [US], et al) [X] 16,18 * the whole document * [A] 1-15,17; | [XA]WO2019209576 (DANISCO US INC [US]) [X] 16,18 * pages 1-3, paragraph 217 *[A] 1-15,17; | [XA]WO2019229108 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [X] 16,18 * page 10 - page 11 * [A] 1-15,17; | [A] - "Trichoderma reesei QM6a chromosome VI, complete sequence", EMBL,, (20170301), XP002802978 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | - VISHNU et al., "Trends in bioconversion of lignocellulose: Biofuels, platform chemicals & biorefinery concept in bioconversion of lignocellulose: Biofuels, platform chemicals & biorefinery concept", Progress in Energy and Combustion Science, (20120800), vol. 38, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.pecs.2012.02.002, pages 522 - 550, XP028488763 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pecs.2012.02.002 | - PRASAD et al., Bioethanol production from waste lignocelluloses: A review on microbial degradation potential Chemosphere, (20190900), vol. 231, pages 588 - 60 | - ASLANIDISDE JONG, Nucleic Acid Res, (19900000), vol. 18, no. 20, page 6069 | - PENTTILA et al., Gene, (19870000), vol. 61, pages 155 - 164 | - GRUBER et al., Curr Genet, (19900000), vol. 18, pages 71 - 76 |