EP4015916 - HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Gerhard 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 02 /
MILANESI, Filippo 47122 Forli / IT | 03 /
VIROLI, Alex 47122 Forli / IT | 04 /
CASO, Daniele 47122 Forli / IT | 05 /
HÄUTLE, Ulrich 91541 Rothenburg ob der Tauber / DE | 06 /
REBELEIN, Elisabeth 91541 Rothenburg / DE | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2022/25] | Application number, filing date | 20214653.6 | 16.12.2020 | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4015916 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/10, H01R12/58, H01R13/10, H05B6/12 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
F24C15/104 (EP);
F24C15/108 (US);
H01R4/4863 (US);
H05B6/1209 (EP,US);
H05B2206/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/05] |
Former [2022/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZUSAMMENBAU EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTS | [2022/25] | English: | HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE AND METHOD FOR ASSEMBLING A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE | [2022/25] | French: | APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE DE L'APPAREIL DOMESTIQUE | [2022/25] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/05] | 22.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2945463 (E G O ELEKTRO GERÄTEBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20* figure - *; | [XA]WO2015180956 (ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AB [SE]) [X] 1 * figures 5-7 * [A] 2-20; | [A]EP3104665 (EGO ELEKTRO GERAETEBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * figure - *; | [XI]US2019297688 (PARACHINI DAVIDE [IT], et al) [X] 1-4,7,15-17 * paragraphs [0035] , [0044]; figures 4A,4B,5A * [I] 5,6,8-14,18-20; | [XA]EP3547799 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1 * figures 3,5,9-10 * [A] 2-20 |